Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF ISAAC CROWTHER

Charity number: 258511
Charity reporting is overdue by 1410 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1045 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1045 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1410 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1410 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 September 2020 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required