WEST INDIA COMMITTEE

Charity Number: 258545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The West India Committee exists as a venerable UK charity whose object is to promote the interests of agriculture, manufacturing industries and trade of the West Indies, Belize and Guyana and thus increase the general welfare of those territories [and their people globally] [delivering] through education, training, acting as an advocate, adviser and where necessary, as an umbrella organisation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £60,840
Total expenditure: £122,723

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Anguilla
  • Antigua And Barbuda
  • Aruba
  • Barbados
  • Belize
  • Bermuda
  • British Virgin Islands
  • Cayman Islands
  • Cuba
  • Dominica
  • Grenada
  • Guadeloupe
  • Guyana
  • Jamaica
  • Martinique
  • Montserrat
  • Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
  • Saint Barthélemy
  • Saint Vincent
  • Sint Maarten
  • St Kitts And Nevis
  • St Lucia
  • Suriname
  • The Bahamas
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Turks And Caicos Islands

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 July 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Forde KC Trustee 31 October 2024
BRITISH FOUNDATION FOR THE UNIVERSITY OF THE WEST INDIES
Received: On time
Victor Franklin Banks Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Sir Rodney Williams Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Peter Beckingham Trustee 07 March 2018
None on record
PETER JULIAN ODLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £328.08k £228.35k £149.83k £216.03k £60.84k
Total expenditure £228.18k £222.25k £253.30k £199.43k £122.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £44.58k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o The Remembrance Trust
Lord Warden House
Lord Warden Square
DOVER
Kent
CT17 9EQ
Phone:
01304 448900