CHURCHES CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity Number: 258612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The CCT is registered as a charity (number 258612) . It's governing document is the Mission and Pastoral Measure 2011. It's main object is the preservation, in the interests of the nation and of the Church of England, of redundant churches and parts of churches of historic and archaeological interest or architectural quality vested in the Trust, together with their contents.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 June 1969: Standard registration
  • 25 July 2013: Funds received from 243422 THE CLERK'S FIELD (STRETFORD)
  • 25 July 2013: Funds received from 292291 CHURCH LANDS (ISLINGTON)
  • 21 January 2014: Funds received from 282008 SARAH BARBARA TAUNTON
  • 08 April 2019: Funds received from 1129897 ALL SOULS BOLTON
  • 20 October 2023: Funds received from 272191 H L JENKYNS CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 05 January 2024: Funds received from 286488 THE INGLEBY CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 05 January 2024: Funds received from 286488 THE INGLEBY CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • REDUNDANT CHURCHES FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Erin Walsh Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Tanvir Hasan Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Dr Oliver Cox Trustee 10 January 2022
None on record
Inayat Omarji Trustee 10 January 2022
CHURCHES CONSERVATION
Received: 12 days late
Rev TIMOTHY GOODE Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Susan Linda Wilkinson Trustee 22 June 2017
MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE REGENT (CHRISTCHURCH) LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ENGLISH HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
Graham William Donaldson Trustee 22 June 2017
CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND
Received: On time
MS Liz Peace Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.45m £11.10m £11.74m £9.94m £12.27m
Total expenditure £8.48m £11.12m £11.39m £9.57m £12.24m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.61m £4.53m £2.92m £2.90m £2.96m
Income - Donations and legacies £654.63k £712.83k £879.17k £1.14m £1.93m
Income - Other trading activities £577.62k £353.57k £662.86k £836.99k £787.37k
Income - Charitable activities £7.19m £10.02m £10.17m £7.92m £9.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £24.17k £17.88k £19.22k £39.57k £56.33k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £135.98k £222.67k £282.63k £547.31k £1.22m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.43m £10.23m £10.37m £8.43m £10.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.05m £891.87k £1.02m £1.14m £1.24m
Expenditure - Governance £32.05k £29.43k £27.87k £67.76k £56.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.06m £0 £1.03m £1.48m
Expenditure - Investment management £2.76k £2.78k £7.80k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £357 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £325.79k £407.05k £416.03k £380.59k £377.99k
Other assets £2.96m £3.49m £4.02m £3.73m £4.03m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.78m £2.33m £2.50m £1.84m £2.11m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit 14 Vulcan Works
34-38 Guildhall Road
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 1EW
Phone:
08453032760