Financial history THE ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE ZAKARIYYA JAAM'E MASJID

Charity Number: 258624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £437.06k £375.05k £602.72k £776.17k £811.34k
Total expenditure £531.26k £529.23k £518.07k £727.78k £738.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.80k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £297.96k £635.39k £551.90k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £83.06k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £221.69k £140.77k £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £518.07k £727.78k £738.51k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £12.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £207.79k £364.65k £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0