Trustees THE ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE ZAKARIYYA JAAM'E MASJID
Charity Number: 258624

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irfan Sardar | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Mohamed Rafiq Patel | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohmadirfan Aiyub DHALECH | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edris Alli Musa | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ASLAM EBRAHIM ATCHA | Trustee | 26 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Farook Dawood Chapti | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Kathrada | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Imran Musa | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Iqbal Umerji | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Suleman Mohamed Kola | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Mohamed Patel | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Aslam Atcha | Trustee | 30 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Siraz Issa Giga | Trustee | 30 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ABDULLAH VALLI MOHMED | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.