Financial history BACKWELL PARISH HALL

Charity number: 258636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.82k £16.02k £21.24k £20.38k £42.84k
Total expenditure £29.03k £15.18k £20.34k £16.57k £42.04k
Income from government contracts £1.40k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £10.00k £9.74k £3.00k £18.61k