Trustees BACKWELL PARISH HALL

Charity number: 258636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Dominic Stagg Chair 28 April 2022
None on record
Dr William Charnock Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Professor Christopher McMahon Trustee 25 April 2019
None on record
Christopher Elliott Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
SARAH OULD Trustee 08 June 2012
None on record