THE BURTONS' ST LEONARDS SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society is a conservation society particularly created to protect the conservation area of Burtons' St Leonards. It monitors all planning applications for the area and spearheads campaigns when necessary. It also encourages high architectural standards for any new developments. It operates an exhibition from its premises, provides education and advice to property owners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Sussex
Governance
- 10 June 1969: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 01 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernard McGinley | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHRISTOPHER VAN DULKEN | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Grant Millington | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Tromans | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Angela CHILDS | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hughie Bryant | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Maxwell Stewart | Trustee | 28 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.69k | £1.61k | £2.68k | £2.59k | £3.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.18k | £2.51k | £2.20k | £3.79k | £2.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 16TH JUNE 1970
Charitable objects
A) TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING IN ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA. B) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE AREA OF ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA AND ITS SURROUNDINGS. C) TO ENCOURAGE AND PURSUE BY ALL PROPER MEANS THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST IN PARTICULAR THE CONTRIBUTION MADE BY JAMES AND DECIMUS BURTON TO THE ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING OF ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA.
Area of benefit
ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA AND ITS SURROUNDINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 WEST ASCENT
ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA
TN38 0BB
- Phone:
- 07923271937
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window