FRIENDS OF LEWES-THE LEWES CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society's objectives are to stimulate public interest in the beauty, history and character of the town of Lewes and its surrounding area; to organise concerted action for protecting and enhancing the townscape of Lewes and the architectural, visual and historic interest of Lewes and the surrounding area and for preserving free access to the latter; and to co-operate with kindred societies. It
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 16 June 1969: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF LEWES (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF LEWES (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Ruth O'Keeffe MBE | Chair |
|
||||||
Diana Jane Freestone | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Bronagh Liddicoat | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Slater | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Earl | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY JARVIS | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MASKEW | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.78k | £12.53k | £12.56k | £8.49k | £15.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.34k | £4.09k | £10.19k | £8.51k | £9.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 28TH MARCH 1969 AND AMENDED MARCH 1987, MARCH 1989, MARCH 1990, MARCH 1993, MARCH 1994 AND MARCH 1997. AS AMENDED ON 30 MAR 2017 as amended on 26 Mar 2020 as amended on 26 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE: (A) HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND DESIGN IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND ENSURE THAT NEW DEVELOPMENT IS SENSITIVELY SITED IN RELATION TO THE SURROUNDING ENVIRONMENT. (B) THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST, AND THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (C) ENHANCEMENT OF THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT IN, AND THE SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND ECONOMIC WELL-BEING OF, THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (D) FREE ACCESS TO THE PUBLIC REALM IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (2)TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (3)TO CO-OPERATE WITH PUBLIC AUTHORITIES AND OTHER BODIES IN FULFILLING THESE OBJECTIVES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF LEWES AND ITS SURROUNDINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lewes Town Council Offices
Town Hall
High Street
LEWES
East Sussex
BN7 2QS
- Phone:
- 01273 011105
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window