Financial history LAND RENTS OTHERWISE CHURCH FIELD OR CHURCH CLOSE

Charity number: 258839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £430 £430 £645 £430 £430
Total expenditure £325 £400 £400 £296 £269
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A