THE BARON BURTON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Income - Derived from investment portfolio. Expenditure -Donations to humanitarian national charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 June 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saffery Trustees UK Limited | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
THE HONOURABLE ALEXANDER JAMES BAILLIE | Trustee | 03 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ARAMINTA JANE DALLMEYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.65k | £1.01k | £9.34k | £3.28k | £2.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.00k | £5.00k | £7.00k | £4.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH DECEMBER 1968 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR OTHERWISE TO APPLY SUCH INCOME FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Torridon House
BEECHWOOD PARK
INVERNESS
IV2 3BW
- Phone:
- 01463246300
- Email:
- margi.campbell@saffery.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window