THE FAIRBANK SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the Charity is the provision of supported sheltered housing for elderly local people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 June 1969: Standard registration
- THE ABBEYFIELD KIRKBY LONSDALE SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR DAVID GARETH THOMAS | Chair | 03 December 2013 |
|
|||||||||
Lesley Janet Barrett | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Joanne Lesley Whittaker | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||
David George Hacking | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Anne Pettifor | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
MARY QUINN | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Gillian Audrey Sykes | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|||||||||
MERLIN HIBBS | Trustee | 21 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
LYNDA SKINNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr IAIN MELVIN BRIDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £498.77k | £451.48k | £508.57k | £536.53k | £486.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £471.76k | £453.62k | £435.29k | £507.28k | £534.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £320 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £478.57k | £510.97k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £22.29k | £22.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £2.70k | £2.37k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £435.29k | £507.28k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £13.16k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/03/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/07/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/04/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/05/2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE SUPPORTED SHELTERED ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR ADULTS TO RELIEVE LONELINESS, HARDSHIP, INSECURITY OR OTHER NEEDS AND TO ENABLE RESIDENTS TO LIVE ACTIVE FULFILLED LIVES AS FAR AS THEY ARE ABLE; AND (2) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY OF KIRKBY LONSDALE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE LONELY, INSECURE, SUFFER HARDSHIP OR ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED OF SUPPORT BY ENCOURAGING AND ENABLING INDIVIDUALS AND THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE TO ENGAGE WITH THEM.
Area of benefit
KIRKBY LONDSDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Fairbank Society
Fairbank
Kirkby Lonsdale
LA6 2BD
- Phone:
- 01524271077
- Email:
- manager@fairbanksociety.com
- Website:
-
fairbanksociety.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window