TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH AT ERDINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To repair and maintain the Roman Catholic church in the Parish of Erdington
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 30 June 1969: Standard registration
- ERDINGTON PROPERTY TRUST (Working name)
- ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH (Previous name)
- TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND MICHAEL MCGREEVY CSSR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REVEREND BEVERLEY M AHEARN C SS R | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV KEVIN CALLAGHAN CSSR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH OCTOBER 1895 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER S74D OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 18 JANUARY 2008.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF (A) A CHURCH OR CHAPEL FOR THE CELEBRATION OF DIVINE WORSHIP ACCORDING TO THE RITES OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION. (B) A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF BOTH OR EITHER SEX EITHER GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE IN SECULAR AND RELIGIOUS KNOWLEDGE ACCORDING TO THE PRECEPTS OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION. (C) A RESIDENCE FOR A PRIEST OR PERSONS ENGAGED IN SERVING SUCH CHURCH OR MANAGING OR TEACHING IN ANY SUCH SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS. (D) A CEMETERY OR BURYING PLACE OF PERSONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME PERMIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS MONASTERY
HATTON ROAD
PERTH
PH2 7BP
- Phone:
- 01738587907
- Email:
- rmcainsh@yahoo.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window