SOUTHPORT PARAPLEGIC SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing sports for the disabled and social activities for the spinal patients at the hospital in Southport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Sefton
- St Helens
Governance
- 11 July 1969: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALLEN GIBBONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK COBURN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN LATHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN LITTLEWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM SUDDELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £3 | £20 | £55 | |
|
Total expenditure | £63 | £63 | £0 | £20 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AUGUST 1961
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE INTEREST FOR THE BETTERMENT OF PARAPLEGIC, QUASTRAPLEGIC AND EX-PATIENTS OF SOUTHPORT SPINAL UNIT AND FOR THE FACILITIES OF FURTHER REHABILITATION AND RECREATIONAL AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 PINE DALE
RAINFORD
ST. HELENS
WA11 8DP
- Phone:
- 01744882864
- Email:
- markcoburn@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window