IFIELD BARN THEATRE SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To foster and promote the improvement and development of artistic taste and the knowledge of and appreciation of drama and the arts among residents in the North Sussex area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 June 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 31 July 1969: Standard registration
- 07 January 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 07 January 2022: Funds transferred to 1194760 IFIELD BARN THEATRE SOCIETY
- IFIELD BARN THEATRE (Working name)
- IFIELD THEATRE CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 27/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.83k | £43.75k | £42.49k | £48.38k | £27.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.46k | £35.42k | £40.82k | £36.99k | £30.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 June 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 June 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 13 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | 13 August 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 02 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | 02 September 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 30TH JUNE 1969 AS AMENDED AT ANNUAL GENERAL MEETING ON THE 30TH JULY 1970 AND 23RD JULY 1973 as amended on 13 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND THE KNOWLEDGE OF AND APPRECIATION OF DRAMA AND THE ARTS AMONG THE RESIDENTS IN THE NORTH SUSSEX AREA.
Area of benefit
NORTH SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window