THE CAMBRIAN COAST EVANGELICAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of accommodation for Scripture Union mission teams in Abersoch and Nefyn; support of other Christian activities in the Llyn peninsula.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 25 August 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Margaret Franklin | Chair | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Charles Wilsdon | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Gowers | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
GRACE BROADHURST | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|||||
MS BILLIE THAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOANNE HOPKINS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS TASHA INGLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MARTYN CUNDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ANNE GAGER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.63k | £34.28k | £38.56k | £65.41k | £45.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.39k | £34.09k | £37.78k | £40.22k | £62.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 08 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 08 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 12 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 12 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 JUNE 1969
Charitable objects
THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LINDSELL
HAVERBREAKS ROAD
LANCASTER
LA1 5BJ
- Phone:
- 07546186600
- Email:
- annegager@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window