LEIGHTON BUZZARD MENCAP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides help, advice, playgroups, holiday scheme for people of all ages with learning disabilities and their parents/carers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 08 August 1969: Standard registration
- LEIGHTON BUZZARD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY (Previous name)
- LEIGHTON BUZZARD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN (Previous name)
- LEIGHTON BUZZARD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
- LEIGHTON BUZZARD MENCAP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs GAYE BEATTIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Evelyn Bennett | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Porter | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Lunn | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER INGRAM | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NELSON DEACON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.46k | £14.01k | £23.66k | £21.65k | £22.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.70k | £8.98k | £20.20k | £29.87k | £34.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.50k | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/04/1969 AS AMENDED ON 16/02/1984 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/2012 as amended on 15 May 2023
Charitable objects
Advancing the health, education and the well-being of people with a learning disability and their families and carers (the beneficiaries) by providing, procuring or facilitating care, services and facilities and to advance equality and diversity for people with a learning disability.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTISE LEIGHTON BUZZARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stratfords
Lower Way
Padbury
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 2AX
- Phone:
- 01280821493
- Email:
- info@lbmencap.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window