Governing document LEIGHTON BUZZARD MENCAP
Charity number: 259104

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/04/1969 AS AMENDED ON 16/02/1984 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/2012 as amended on 15 May 2023
Charitable objects
Advancing the health, education and the well-being of people with a learning disability and their families and carers (the beneficiaries) by providing, procuring or facilitating care, services and facilities and to advance equality and diversity for people with a learning disability.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTISE LEIGHTON BUZZARD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.