THE LUDGATE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial support to schemes offering performance opportunities to young instrumentalists
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 August 1969: Standard registration
- 18 August 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.20k | £16.03k | £14.39k | £11.81k | £10.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £345 | £54.35k | £33.36k | £2 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 14 June 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 14 June 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 09 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 11 August 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 23 July 2010 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 23 July 2010 | 265 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 15 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 15 July 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 2ND APRIL 1969
Charitable objects
A.1) TO PROVIDE OR JOIN WITH OTHERS IN PROVIDING AND ENDOWING A HOSTEL OR HOSTELS FOR STUDENTS AND TO ASSIST OTHERS TO MAKE SUCH PROVISION OR ENDOV.WMENT BY SUBSCRIBING TO ANY CHARITABLE FUND ESTABLISHED FOR THE LIKE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES. 2) TO PROVIDE SCHOLARSHIPS ENDOWMENTS OR GRANTS TO ASSIST STUDENTS AND TO PROVIDE BOOKS MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND OTHER NECESSARY EQUIPMENT FOR THE USE OF ANY SUCH STUDENTS SO FAR AS SUCH PROVISION IS CHARITABLE. 3) IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THESE PROVISIONS ARE INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF STUDENTS OF MUSIC AT THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF MUSIC OR OTHER SIMILAR ESTABLISHMENT AND TO ASSIST STUDENTS TO COME FROM ABROAD TO STUDY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. B9 TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED IMPOTENET AND POOR PEOPLE OF ALL CLASSES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIGION AND FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window