NORTHERN BALLET LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Northern Ballet is a classical ballet company which tours for approximately 26 weeks each year to 18 cities within the United Kingdom. Performances are narrative, theatrical and dramatic and are accessible to a diverse range of audiences who would not otherwise see the highest quality of dance. Northern Ballet is also committed to advancing education in the arts through training and workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£8,957,952
Donations and legacies | £4.94m | |
Charitable activities | £2.14m | |
Other trading activities | £347.83k | |
Investments | £671 | |
Other | £1.53m |
Total expenditure:
£7,921,047
Raising funds | £1.41m | |
Charitable activities | £6.51m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,555,435 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.41m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.51m | |
Retained for future use | £1.04m |
People

127 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 September 1969: Standard registration
- NORTHERN BALLET THEATRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- NORTHERN DANCE THEATRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guido Roberto Perricone Mr | Chair | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew McNaught | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Kate Fisher | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sonny Hanley | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Kyla Mullins | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Clive Roland Lloyd | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Jolyon Leonard Harrison | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
PHILIP KELLER | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Carol Ann Arrowsmith | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Kevin O'Hare | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Elizabeth Jackson | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.41m | £8.74m | £8.58m | £8.97m | £8.96m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.19m | £6.50m | £8.91m | £10.22m | £7.92m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.72m | £2.66m | £4.32m | £3.74m | £3.56m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.98m | £5.60m | £5.75m | £4.70m | £4.94m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £794.85k | £315.98k | £246.47k | £434.96k | £347.83k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.63m | £2.31m | £1.56m | £2.89m | £2.14m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.82k | £0 | £859 | £1.19k | £671 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £514.96k | £1.02m | £944.44k | £1.53m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £104.00k | £110.00k | £34.97k | £0 | £75.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.36m | £5.58m | £7.93m | £9.08m | £6.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £826.32k | £921.38k | £987.16k | £1.14m | £1.41m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £27.50k | £32.50k | £37.80k | £45.40k | £28.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.37m | £12.27m | £12.34m | £12.25m | £12.03m | |
|
Long-term investments | £65.57k | £305.48k | £305.42k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.07m | £4.31m | £3.44m | £2.77m | £4.40m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£359.20k | -£374.22k | -£239.29k | -£513.36k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.49m | £1.54m | £1.21m | £1.14m | £1.99m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/01/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/05/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/12/2014
Charitable objects
1.1 TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND BALLETS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC. 1.2 TO PRESENT, PRODUCE, MANAGE, CONDUCT, PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND PROVIDE SUCH PLAYS, BALLETS, DRAMAS, OPERAS, OPERETTAS, BURLESQUES, PUPPET SHOWS, FILMS, BROADCASTS, CONCERTS, MUSICAL PIECES, ENTERTAINMENTS AND EXHIBITIONS AS ARE CONDUCIVE TO THE PROMOTION, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR TO THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS. 1.3 TO ADVANCE THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE BY CO-OPERATING WITH CHARITIES CONDUCTING SUCH PURPOSES IN ORDER TO PROMOTE, DEVELOP AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF SUCH PLAYS, BALLETS, DRAMAS, OPERAS, OPERETTAS, BURLESQUES, PUPPET SHOWS, FILMS, BROADCASTS, CONCERTS, MUSICAL PIECES, ENTERTAINMENTS AND EXHIBITIONS CARRIED OUT BY THOSE CHARITIES. 1.4 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC AMENITY.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northern Ballet
2 St. Cecilia Street
LEEDS
LS2 7PA
- Phone:
- 01132208000
- Email:
- info@northernballet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window