THE COUNCIL OF MANCHESTER AND SALFORD JEWS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity deals with general charitable purposes. In particular we promote education/training, relief of poverty, overseas aid and famine relief, religious activities. We help children/young people, elderly/old people, people of a particular ethnic or racial origin, other charities/voluntary bodies. In general we carry out the above by making grants available to individuals and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 28 July 1969: Standard registration
- GREATER MANCHESTER JEWISH YOUTH & COMMUNITY TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON BANNISTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Rubinstein | Trustee | 11 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Jacob BUCHSBAUM | Trustee | 11 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ANTHONY LANGER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53k | £5.20k | £4.72k | £17.16k | £3.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.47k | £5.56k | £4.62k | £16.95k | £9.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH DECEMBER, 1967
Charitable objects
I) ASSISTANCE IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF JEWISH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS. II) ASSISTANCE IN THE CARRYING ON OF STUDIES AND RESEARCH IN JUDAISM, JEWISH HISTORY, SOCIOLOGY AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH STUDIES AND RESEARCH. III) ASSISTANCE IN THE MAINTENANCE OF DISUSED JEWISH CEMETERIES. IV) RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF JEWISH REFUGEES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD. V) FOR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF DECLARATION OF TRUST)
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HEATHLANDS VILLAGE
HEATHLANDS DRIVE
PRESTWICH
MANCHESTER
M25 9SB
- Phone:
- 01617208721
- Email:
- office@jewishmanchester.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window