Financial history THE BLUES AND ROYALS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 259191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £65.33k £84.11k £99.02k £141.41k £99.55k
Total expenditure £75.88k £102.01k £81.85k £151.07k £98.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A