THE BLUES AND ROYALS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
By granting temporary financial assistance for the relief of members or their dependants, who are in need. Non-members of the Association, their wives, widows or children and other dependants in distressed circumstances may also receive temporary assistance at the discretion of the Committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Germany
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Spain
Governance
- 19 September 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt COLONEL JIM EYRE | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Grayburn Russell Owen AGR | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Herman Ah Sam | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peat | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jason Lee Naylor | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Jones | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Les Kibble | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Harris AM | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Foster | Trustee | 10 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Trinick | Trustee | 10 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Storer | Trustee | 10 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Gillingham | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS HEMMING | Trustee | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.33k | £84.11k | £99.02k | £141.41k | £99.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.88k | £102.01k | £81.85k | £151.07k | £98.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 3RD MAY 1969
Charitable objects
PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE REGIMENT KNOWN AS THE BLUES AND ROYALS (ROYALS HORSE GUARDS AND 1ST DRAGOONS).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oak House
Stafford Road
STONE
Staffordshire
ST15 0BH
- Phone:
- 07881625124
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window