HENRY GEORGE FOUNDATION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of classes lectures and discussion groups on economics and the social sciences and the publication of "Land & Liberty" a magazine of analysis and comment on the core issues of economics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 August 1969: Standard registration
- ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL SCIENCE RESEARCH ASSOCIATION LTD (Previous name)
- HENRY GEORGE FOUNDATION OF GREAT BRITAIN LIMITED (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Graham Blackbourn | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
June Mulford | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Purves | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Scott | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan William Pickard | Trustee | 13 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Richard Allan Bolton | Trustee | 13 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ms Angela ST CLAIR | Trustee | 14 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Susan ATTACK | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LEAROYD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.37k | £28.28k | £123.59k | £31.22k | £141.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.08k | £41.99k | £30.05k | £25.57k | £39.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 February 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 February 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/06/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/04/1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2013 as amended on 17 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING BY RESEARCH INTO ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL SCIENCE AND BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC THEREIN AND IN PARTICULAR BY PUBLISHING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROPAGATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF IDEAS AND RESEARCH DEALING WITH OR IN PURSUANCE OF ANY OF THE SAID OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Henry George Foundation
c/o School of Economic Science
11 Mandeville Place
LONDON
W1U 3AJ
- Phone:
- 07770 917723
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window