GWYNEDD HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS/CYFEILLION YSBYTY GWYNEDD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity is set up to provide amenities and equipment for the benefit of patients, staff and relatives of patients where such amenities and equipment are not provided for under NHS budgets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Conwy
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 25 August 1969: Standard registration
- BANGOR HOSPITALS LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOE DAVID HUGHES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dorothy Hughes | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN PRITCHARD | Trustee | 09 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
IONA WYN JONES | Trustee | 09 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE JONES | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEWI AERON MORGAN | Trustee | 28 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANN ROBERTS | Trustee | 09 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATH JONES | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
CEINWEN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MERYL WYNNE READ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EIRLYS ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMAN EVANS | Trustee |
|
||||||
IONA JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEAN CATHERINE PIERCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PEGGY LAIDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENYS HEFINA MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLYNN MARGARET EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.71k | £6.29k | £4.42k | £6.23k | £1.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.46k | £831 | £1.48k | £645 | £43.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 March 2025 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 March 2025 | 396 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JULY 1969 AS AMENDED ON 14 APRIL 1997.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE BANGOR HOSPITALS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITALS. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Ffrydlas Road
Carneddi
Bethesda
Bangor
LL57 3BL
- Phone:
- 01248601902
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window