THE MAGNUS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 August 1969: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.37k | £2.42k | £3.30k | £674 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £16.58k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH JULY 1969
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY TH EINCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND ALSO SO MUCH OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THE SETTLORS JOINTLY OR SEVERALLY OR THE SURVIVOR OF THEM MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY DIRECTION IN WRITING TO THE TRUSTEE DETERMINE TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE SETTLORS OR THE SURVIVOR OF THEM MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY LIKE WRITTEN DIRECTION REQUEST AND SUBJECT OT AND IN DEFAULT OF ANY SUCCH DIRECTION AND INSOFAR AS SUCH DIRECTION MAY NOT EXTEND AS THE TRUSTEE MAY AT ITS UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE. FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF TRUST DEED DATED 17TH JULY 1969.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
National Council For Voluntary
Organisations
Society Building
8 Regents Wharf
All Saints Street
N1 9RL
- Phone:
- 02075202531
- Email:
- fiona.clark@ncvo.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window