WILLIAM PENGELLY CAVE STUDIES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of cave studies and research, education residential resource for people of all ages. Provison of a museum/interpretation centre, publication of educational material relatibng to cave science. Out reach work to schools and adults groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 21 September 1969: Standard registration
- WILLIAM PENGELLY CAVE STUDIES TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WARNE | Chair | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Hall | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Brodribb | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beth Cramman | Trustee | 14 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL JEAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILMUT | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD VOOGHT | Trustee |
|
||||||
Alan Finch | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.61k | £16.02k | £14.98k | £11.99k | £14.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.88k | £17.11k | £7.58k | £16.53k | £10.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.15k | £10.30k | £2.81k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 22 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE OF SPELAEOLOGY. B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THAT SCIENCE. C) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF SCIENTIFIC FEATURES OF CAVES AND THEIR ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ZENNOR
SOUTH ZEAL
OKEHAMPTON
EX20 2QA
- Phone:
- 01837840259
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window