Financial history THE BARNETT TRUST

Charity number: 259308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.13k £939 £1.43k £2.93k £2.68k
Total expenditure £1.45k £1.30k £960 £6.77k £2.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A