Accounts and annual returns TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE HURSTPIERPOINT EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH

Charity number: 259381
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 September 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 August 2018 On Time