Financial history ENGLISH EVANGELICAL SISTERHOOD OF MARY

Charity number: 259421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £57.63k £67.30k £337.73k £85.53k £156.34k
Total expenditure £126.24k £71.69k £173.22k £155.85k £166.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A