ENGLISH EVANGELICAL SISTERHOOD OF MARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DISTRIBUTES CHRISTIAN LITERATURE,DVD'S ETC.. HOLDS OPEN DAYS AND RETREATS FOR PRAYER MEDITATION AND BIBLE STUDY PROVIDES BEREAVEMENT AND OTHER COUNSELLING ON REQUEST TAKES PART IN SEPARATE AND JOINT CHRISTIAN AND JEWISH EVENTS HAS A MINISTRY OF HOSPITALITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 September 1969: Standard registration
- MARY SISTERS (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER GLORY JOHNSTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SISTER THEKLA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.63k | £67.30k | £337.73k | £85.53k | £156.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.24k | £71.69k | £173.22k | £155.85k | £166.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 May 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 May 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 25TH OF AUGUST 1969
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, AND IN PARTICULAR BY UNDERTAKING VARIOUS SERVICES OF A SPIRITUAL AND PRACTICAL NATURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF MANKIND.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Gills Hill Lane
Radlett
WD7 8DE
- Phone:
- 01923856316
- Email:
- sistersofmaryuk@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window