STAFFORD UNITED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouse accommodation for residents of the Borough of Stafford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 22 September 1969: Standard registration
- ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frank Douglas Joseph James | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Barron | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Loughran | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Pert | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Mason | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|||||
JAMES CANTRILL | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
John Wallace Sly | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.20k | £47.20k | £43.65k | £49.08k | £51.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.66k | £39.20k | £35.61k | £31.92k | £34.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 20 JULY 1962.
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF STAFFORD.
Linked charities
- ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF REVEREND JOHN PALMER
- DAME BARBARA CROMPTON
- HENRY WOODHOUSE
- ISSAK WALTON FOR NON-EDUCATIONAL PURPOSE
- JOHN SHALLCROSS
- OLIVE JENKINSON
- REBECCA CROMPTON FOR NON-EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES
- REVEREND JOHN PALMER
- REVEREND ROBERT SUTTON FOR NON-EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES
- ROBERT LEVETT
- SIR MARTIN NOEL'S ALMSHOUSES AND SUBSIDIARY ENDOWMENTS
- THE POOR BURGESSES FUND
- THE STRANAGHAN ALMSHOUSE TRUST
- WILLIAM FARMER FOR NON-EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES
- WILLIAM MARSON
- 22 September 1969 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Dawlish Avenue
Stafford
Staffordshire
ST17 0EU
- Phone:
- 01785 663095
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window