SOUTHAMPTON HOSPITAL BROADCASTING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hospital Radio Broadcasting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 19 March 1970: Standard registration
- SOUTHAMPTON HOSPITAL RADIO (Working name)
- HOSPITAL BROADCASTING ASSOCIATION (SOUTHAMPTON AND WINCHESTER) (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aaron Jacobs | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lee Moulsdale | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Oakley | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brian White | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS GARDINER | Trustee | 22 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALAN FITCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN LAMBOURN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.37k | £6.19k | £8.14k | £10.60k | £9.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.57k | £18.22k | £7.22k | £7.55k | £7.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AMENDED 10 FEBRUARY 1970 AS AMENDED 19 MARCH 1991, 21 MARCH 1997 AND 24 MARCH 2009. as amended on 20 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, OLD AGE AND INFIRMITY, BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR OLD PEOPLE'S HOMES, HOSPITALS AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
Normand House
121-123 Tremona Road
Southampton
SO16 6HU
- Phone:
- 02380785151
- Email:
- studio@shradio.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window