Financial history THE CHARITY OF PRISCILLA GENT AND OTHERS

Charity Number: 259461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.97k £7.47k £8.49k £9.74k £10.53k
Total expenditure £5.89k £5.65k £4.24k £6.02k £5.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A