THE FUND FOR THE REPLACEMENT OF ANIMALS IN MEDICAL EXPERIMENTS (F R A M E)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FRAME researches, develops and promotes practical alternative techniques that can be used to replace live animals in biomedical research. FRAME advocates the Three Rs approach: REDUCE the number of animals used, REFINE procedures to minimise animal suffering and REPLACE animals by eliminating the need to use them through the validation of alternative techniques.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 September 1969: Standard registration
- THE FUND FOR THE REPLACEMENT OF ANIMALS IN MEDICAL EXPERIMENTS ("F R A M E ") (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Purminder Singh Gill | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|||
Dr Anja Petrie | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £385.48k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND MORAL IMPROVEMENT OF MANKIND BY WORKING TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PARTICULARLY WHEN SUCH ANIMALS ARE BEING USED AS SUBJECTS FOR MEDICAL, BIOLOGICAL, PHARMACEUTICAL AND OTHER ASSOCIATED RESEARCHES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE TRUST DEED DATED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1969).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRAME
Cawley House
149-155 Canal Street
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 7HR
- Phone:
- 01159503044
- Email:
- frame@frame.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window