CYMDEITHAS COR MEIBION MYRDDIN

Charity Number: 259482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

If requested, the choir sings at Charitable Events or other Functions anywhere within Carmarthenshire,Pembrokeshire and Ceredigion.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,829
Total expenditure: £8,491

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Carmarthenshire
  • Ceredigion
  • Pembrokeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • COR MEIBION CAERFYRDDIN (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emlyn Michele James Schiavone Trustee 27 February 2024
None on record
Haydn Lloyd Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record
Ieuan Phillips Trustee 09 December 2019
None on record
Huw Michael Trustee 28 February 2017
THE THOMAS & ELIZABETH MAYHOOK CHARITY
Received: 12 days late
TYWI GATEWAY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.99k £14.16k £1.83k £3.30k £8.83k
Total expenditure £7.70k £12.96k £2.89k £4.38k £8.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TY HIR
PICTON COURT
CARMARTHEN
SA31 3DQ
Phone:
07528719343