SOUTH CARSHALTON SENIORS CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates a Senior Citizens Community Centre in South Carshalton (this charity has been replaced by a CIO registered as a Charity No 1182828 under the same title). The assets and liabilities of this charity were adopted in their entirety by minute at the first Board meeting of the new charity. This Charity ceased trading under this charity registration no 259601 as at 31st March 2019.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sutton
Governance
- 03 November 1969: Standard registration
- 21 January 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 21 January 2022: Funds transferred to 1182828 SOUTH CARSHALTON SENIORS CENTRE
- SOUTH CARSHALTON DAY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.08k | £132.55k | £197.29k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.73k | £141.56k | £188.47k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £38.90k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 29 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 21 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 21 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12/11/1968 AS AMENDED ON 23/10/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF AN OLD PEOPLE'S DAY CENTRE PRIMARILY FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH CARSHALTON IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AS A RECREATIONAL AND WELFARE CENTRE FOR ELDERLEY AND RETIRED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH CARSHALTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window