THE CHARITY OF STELLA SYMONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
general charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 October 1969: Standard registration
- STELLA SYMONS CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- STELLA SYMONS (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE ELIZABETH WARNICK | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN SIMON SHELDON BOSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHERINE ANN WILLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.53k | £81.88k | £74.57k | £94.68k | £83.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.89k | £99.54k | £90.42k | £89.85k | £95.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1968
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 MILL STREET
SHIPSTON-ON-STOUR
WARWICKSHIRE
CV36 4AW
- Phone:
- 01243673455
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window