THE TRUST FOR DEVIZES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To protect and maintain the character and amenities of the Devizes area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 17 December 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Dawson | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Boden | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Guy Fraser Sharpe | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hugh Caton Ormerod | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES FLOOD | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
|||||
Philippa Morgan | Trustee |
|
||||||
INEZ SKINNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN GIRVAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.54k | £2.23k | £2.48k | £2.47k | £2.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.05k | £2.02k | £2.23k | £3.47k | £2.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1967 AS AMENDED 24 MAY 2007 AND 11 JUNE 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND MAINTAIN THE CHARACTER AND AMENITIES OF THE DEVIZES AREA.
Area of benefit
THE DEVIZES AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 LONG STREET
DEVIZES
SN10 1NN
- Phone:
- 01380727108
- Email:
- trustnews@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window