YORKSHIRE EAST RIDING VOLUNTARY ACCIDENT AND EMERGENCY SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BASICs - Emergency Medical Care in a Pre-hospital Environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 October 1969: Standard registration
- 14 April 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE FLYING DOCTOR SERVICE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £538 | £720 | £657 | £6.94k | £2.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.08k | £6.70k | £5.79k | £5.84k | £5.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 30 March 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 05 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 12 August 2009 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 02 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF SWIFT AND ADEQUATE EMERGENCY MEDICAL TREATMENT IN THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE TO ALL PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH TREATMENT WHETHER SUCH NEED IS DUE TO ACCIDENT OR OTHER CAUSE.
Area of benefit
YORKSHIRE EAST RIDING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window