THE TILBURY LODGE NO 2006 MASONIC BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 259668
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 24 October 1969: Standard registration
- 15 November 1993: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BYE LAWS ADOPTED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1967 AS AMENDED 11TH MARCH 1978 AND 5TH JULY 1980
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE THE BRETHREN OF TILBURY LODGE TO MAKE DONATIONS TO ANY REGISTERED CHARITY BUT PARTICULARLY TO THE RMH RMBI RMIG RMIB AND OTHER MASONIC CHARITIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNRESTRICTED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.