THE GARSTANG AND DISTRICT ARTS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Display of paintings and other works of art, changed on an monthly basis, the centre is open to the public Tuesday, Thursday (10am - 4pm) and Saturday mornings. The Arts Society premises are used for Local Authority classes in Painting and are used by the various member groups (Painting, Dancing, Choral, Music, Patchwork etc.) to carry out their activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £7,711 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 31 October 1969: Standard registration
- GARSTANG & DISTRICT ARTS CENTRE (Working name)
- GARSTANG AND DISTRICT ARTS CENTRE (Working name)
- GARSTANG ARTS CENTRE (Working name)
- THE ARTS CENTRE GARSTANG AND DISTRICT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muriel Burnham-Airey | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mavin | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Mary Pearson | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marie Whitehead | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.64k | £23.30k | £6.60k | £33.12k | £48.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.38k | £16.45k | £14.65k | £34.34k | £39.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £7.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 SEPTEMBER 1969 AS AMENDED 1 MARCH 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN GARSTANG AND DISTRICT THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION, EDUCATION, AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
GARSTANG AND DISTRICT INCLUDING NORTH FYLDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Meadow Park
Cabus
PRESTON
PR3 1TA
- Phone:
- 01995603311
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
garstangartssociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window