THE ELMBRIDGE ARTS COUNCIL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encourage appreciation of the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 October 1970: Standard registration
- 26 April 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- ELMBRIDGE DRAMA FESTIVAL (Working name)
- THE WALTON AND WEYBRIDGE ARTS COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40k | £1.96k | £1.61k | £1.40k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02k | £2.30k | £1.98k | £1.69k | £582 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 04 May 2019 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 21 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JULY 1970, AS AMENDED 17TH JANUARY 1975
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE DISTRICT OF ELMBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF ELMBRIDGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window