DR SIMPSON'S MEMORIAL NURSES COTTAGE

Charity number: 259849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide accomodation for district nurse for benifit of the community if required

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 22 April 2024

Total income: £8,785
Total expenditure: £6,259

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Foster Ward Chair
None on record
Tim Volker Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Marion Beatrice Mitchell Trustee 21 February 2023
None on record
ROBIN HERBERT WICKHAM Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/04/2020 22/04/2021 22/04/2022 22/04/2023 22/04/2024
Total gross income £8.50k £7.30k £8.50k £11.30k £8.79k
Total expenditure £3.63k £1.22k £2.51k £6.68k £6.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 April 2024 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 22 April 2023 27 February 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 22 April 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 22 April 2021 19 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 22 April 2020 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Little Crooke Cottage
Crook Road
Brenchley
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN12 7BG
Phone:
01892723195
Website:

No information available