THE ANTON JURGENS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 259885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Anton Jurgens Charitable Trust provides grants of varying sizes to an array of charitable organisations. If you wish to apply for a grant we now only accept online applications via the website address shown.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £287,184
Total expenditure: £318,310

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Guernsey
  • Jersey
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL R BEEK Chair 24 January 2012
None on record
Carlijn Constance Bijvoet Trustee 20 March 2023
None on record
Hans A B Veraart Trustee 25 November 2015
None on record
FRANS C M TILMAN Trustee 07 January 2013
None on record
FRANS A W JURGENS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £275.33k £201.03k £219.18k £260.37k £287.18k
Total expenditure £333.88k £335.42k £326.02k £338.94k £318.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £229.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 April 2023 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 03 April 2023 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 14 October 2022 251 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 14 October 2022 251 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 06 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Saffery Champness
71 Queen Victoria Street
LONDON
Anton Jurgens Charitable Trust
EC4V 4BE
Phone:
01343890777