Financial history DAVID & RUTH LEWIS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 259892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £2.91m £2.77m £3.24m £3.36m £3.49m
Total expenditure £1.52m £1.70m £2.26m £4.01m £3.63m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.52m £2.52m £3.02m £3.02m £3.02m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £394.98k £253.69k £226.50k £348.07k £470.80k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.52m £1.69m £2.26m £4.00m £3.59m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.41k £1.10k £0 £5.93k £31.58k
Expenditure - Governance £12.00k £12.60k £13.23k £21.00k £12.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.51m £1.68m £2.24m £3.93m £3.51m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.41k £1.10k £0 £5.93k £31.58k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0