THE RUDOLF STEINER ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 259946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant making

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £24,044
Total expenditure: £21,701

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Kane Trustee 19 February 2025
None on record
Doris Bailiss Trustee 05 June 2024
None on record
Brendan Patrick McQuillan Trustee 17 October 2019
None on record
Dr SUSAN PEAT Trustee 19 October 2017
NORTH LONDON RUDOLF STEINER SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE WALDORF SCHOOL OF SOUTH-WEST LONDON LIMITED
Received: 82 days late
MICHAEL MEHTA Trustee 26 May 2011
GODPARENTS ANTHROPOSOPHICAL TRAINING FUND
Received: On time
TEDDY PRESTBURY Trustee
LONDON WALDORF TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £20.47k £16.76k £16.58k £16.55k £24.04k
Total expenditure £25.56k £32.42k £18.50k £15.16k £21.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 07 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 15 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT MANCHESTER 8 APRIL 1963
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING A SCHOLARSHIP OR SCHOLARSHIPS FOR TRAINING PUPILS OF THE RUDOLF STEINER SCHOOL OF SPEECH TRAINING AND DRAMATIC ART IN SUCH MANNER AND UPON SUCH CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES OR OTHER GOVERNING BODY OF THE SAID ASSOCIATION SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 03 December 1969 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Manningtons
39 High Street
BATTLE
East Sussex
TN33 0EE
Phone:
02076383202
Website:

No information available