THE SINODUN PLAYERS AMATEUR DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stage plays, show films, provide a venue.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 November 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Paul Baker | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Anna Cecilia Hamilton Garland | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Emma Victoria Trotman | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS STEPHEN MORLEY | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Minaz Beddall | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Martin Parr | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM PETER KENNETH LIDBETTER | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.01k | £25.41k | £86.64k | £133.16k | £145.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.83k | £78.48k | £3.21k | £86.09k | £94.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 16 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 16 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 5 JUNE 1969, AS AMENDED 20 APRIL 1993, 8 SEPTEMBER 1998, 7 SEPTEMBER 1999, 11 SEPTEMBER 2001, 26 SEPTEMBER 2002, 25 JUNE 2006 AND 12 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED ON 27 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART. 2. TO PRESERVE, RESTORE, MAINTAIN AND ENHANCE THE BUILDING KNOWN AS THE CORN EXCHANGE IN WALLINGFORD AS A VENUE FOR THE PUBLIC PERFORMANCE OF THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Corn Exchange Theatre
Market Place
WALLINGFORD
Oxfordshire
OX10 0EG
- Phone:
- 01491825000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window