WEST YORKSHIRE (LEEDS CITY) POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 260062
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004

Total income: £5,457
Total expenditure: £2,338

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 1970: Standard registration
  • 01 August 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • THE LEEDS CITY POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
  • WEST YORKSHIRE METROPOLITAN (LEEDS CITY) POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004
Total gross income £5.46k
Total expenditure £2.34k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 06 May 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required