ARCHIE SCOTT BENEVOLENT FUND FOR BOOKMAKERS' EMPLOYEES (MIDLANDS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 December 1969: Standard registration
- 12 August 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2004 | 12 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 NOVEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
ASSISTANCE TO ANY FORMER BOOKMAKER OR ANY EMPLOYEE OR EX-EMPLOYEE RESIDING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF ANY BOOKMAKER OR DECEASED BOOKMAKER WHO THROUGH SICKNESS OLD, AGE, ACCIDENT OR FOR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSE IS FOR THE TIME BEING UNABLE TO SUPPORT HIMSELF HIS FAMILY AND DEPENDANTS, AND THE WIDOWS AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF ANY DECEASED OR FORMER BOOK-MAKER AND OF ANY DECEASED EMPLOYEE OR EX-EMPLOYEE OF ANY BOOK-MAKER OR FORMER OR DECEASED BOOKMAKER IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window